Trustees GREAT WESTERN PRESERVATIONS LIMITED
Charity number: 1122630
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JOHN HURD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Leigh Drew | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN RILEY | Trustee | 17 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Timothy David Part | Trustee | 12 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROGER JAMES HORWOOD | Trustee | 20 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ALAN PRESTON | Trustee | 08 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr JOHN BERNARD O'HAGAN | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|||||
RICHARD CROUCHER | Trustee |
|
||||||
PETER COLIN CHATMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.