Financial history THE KIRSTY BAKER TRUST FOR ST GEORGE'S CHURCH WEMBDON

Charity number: 1121354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £3.55k £3.75k £3.80k £3.88k £4.02k
Total expenditure £1.78k £5.68k £3.32k £1.95k £6.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A