BRIDGE CHAPEL CENTRE

Charity number: 1122877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £204.20k £191.22k £197.87k £204.07k £219.95k
Total expenditure £171.20k £202.08k £207.30k £202.40k £201.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A