CHARITY VOICE

Charity number: 1122164
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £150 £1.40k £51.47k £22.70k £11.60k
Total expenditure £60 £1.26k £43.40k £19.90k £18.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A