Financial history RIVERSIDE SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1121363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £55.56k £34.49k £24.15k £14.64k £5.88k
Total expenditure £76.06k £47.72k £37.17k £34.07k £13.56k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A