MY ISRAEL

Charity number: 1121960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/12/2019
Total gross income £432.49k £590.03k £751.57k £968.08k £631.61k
Total expenditure £475.43k £540.14k £822.30k £706.93k £534.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £590.03k £751.57k £968.08k £631.61k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £590.03k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £424.95k £644.98k £600.07k £422.37k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £115.19k £177.33k £106.86k £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £2.75k £2.95k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £112.14k