MY ISRAEL

Charity number: 1121960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Mark Walton Chair 09 March 2015 None on record
Alisa Gerrard Trustee 01 December 2020
HIGHGATE PRIMARY AND BLANCHE NEVILE PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION Overdue by 26 days
Marc Ivor Rubinstein Trustee 14 November 2016 None on record
Richard Taylor Trustee 07 December 2020 None on record
Judianne Jayson Trustee 14 November 2016 None on record
Steven James Neerkin Trustee 23 May 2017 None on record
Frances Clare Raff Trustee 18 November 2015 None on record