MEDICAL AID FILMS LIMITED

Charity number: 1121578
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sean Patrick McDonnell Trustee 30 January 2020 None on record
Maila Reeves Trustee 30 January 2020 None on record
Rania Missoumi Trustee 29 October 2020 None on record
Matthew David Jackson Trustee 29 October 2020 None on record
Ankit Ashok Soni Trustee 28 January 2021 None on record
MICHAEL GEORGES DE LATHAUWER Trustee
CURE EB (FORMERLY KNOWN AS SOHANA RESEARCH FUND) Received: On time
Rajiv Christopher Wijesuriya Trustee 30 July 2020 None on record
Alex Moore Trustee 07 July 2016 None on record
Professor Lucie Marie Theresa Byrne-Davis Trustee 30 July 2020 None on record