Dogfen lywodraethu THE SOUTHAMPTON FOSTER CARERS' ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MAY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 3 JULY 2010 as amended on 07 Jul 2018 as amended on 13 Jul 2019 as amended on 06 Jul 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The objectives of the Association shall be for the public benefit to advance education and to protect and preserve the good health of foster carers and the children in their care within the Southampton and surrounding area in particular, but not exclusively, by: a) Promoting the provision of high quality foster care for children looked after, in partnership with Southampton Social Services Department (‘The Department’) and to work with the Department in the practice and promotion of anti-discrimination, anti-racism, and equal opportunities b) Supporting the Department in their recruitment of suitable persons to become foster carers c) Supporting foster carers themselves and promoting and protecting their interests d) Enabling carers to have a stronger voice e) Promoting good working partnerships f) Providing support and guidance g) Supporting and enhancing knowledge and skills required for fostering h) Offering regular social events for everyone
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.