Trustees CITY OF SHEFFIELD HATTERS BASKETBALL CLUB
Charity number: 1122247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vanessa Ellis | Chair | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elysa Ioannou | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Waller | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Waller | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Wright | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Brooks | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vivian Ajagbi | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carrie Hancock | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lianna Murphy | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Southwell | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah McQueen | Trustee | 01 September 2009 |
|
|
||||
LORAINE Davara GAYLE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.