LANCASHIRE CRICKET FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1121855
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £428.80k £549.07k £1.68m £1.36m £1.74m
Total expenditure £486.37k £458.67k £1.84m £1.72m £1.71m
Income from government contracts £0 £36.00k N/A N/A £28.50k
Income from government grants £3.00k £0 £27.00k £36.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £471.25k £1.11m £1.19m £1.27m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £383.17k £3.25k £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £50.37k £75.26k £52.94k £24.57k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £2.80k £1.13k £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £24.65k £106.78k £106.23k £446.25k
Income - Legacies N/A £1.00k £3.00k £0 £45.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £371.85k £1.36m £1.65m £1.64m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £86.82k £114.67k £70.59k £68.40k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £500 £500 £500 £500
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £8.60k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £362.48k £60 £0