BRENTWOOD BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1130944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Moore Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Brian Garner Trustee 25 February 2021 None on record
Nicholas Tavener Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
Jenny Baldwin Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Dr Ruth McMahon Trustee 01 August 2018 None on record
Bryan James Dedman Chair 01 October 2018 None on record