HORSEWORLD TRUST

Charity number: 1121920
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.06m £1.41m £800.38k £1.30m £1.47m
Total expenditure £1.10m £1.09m £1.21m £1.46m £1.50m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £13.00k £13.31k £13.23k
Income - Donations and legacies £834.85k £1.08m £633.46k £989.48k £1.12m
Income - Other trading activities £42.32k £48.00k £56.12k £52.60k £58.62k
Income - Charitable activities £117.16k £44.60k £62.28k £107.78k £82.55k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £51.09k £35.89k £43.18k £155.06k £178.61k
Income - Other £15.09k £202.06k £5.35k £0 £30.14k
Income - Legacies £733.38k £963.46k £515.25k £891.35k £1.02m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £816.82k £840.19k £959.84k £1.05m £1.16m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £246.98k £251.85k £408.29k £341.01k
Expenditure - Governance £84.62k £184.06k £250.61k £44.68k £247.49k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £11.40k £8.87k £10.33k £17.58k £18.03k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0