HORSEWORLD TRUST

Charity number: 1121920
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KERRY GWYTHER Trustee 21 April 2016 None on record
ANDREW DOWDEN Trustee 04 October 2012 None on record
LESLIE BARBARA DILLINGHAM Chair 18 October 2018 None on record
Annette Katarina Newman Trustee 08 June 2017 None on record
Nigel Daniel Trustee 01 August 2015
THE MOTIVATION CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Patricia Marianne Shand Trustee 12 April 2017 None on record
Stephen Robert Webb Trustee 05 December 2019 None on record
Andrew John Beasley Trustee 17 October 2019 None on record
Duncan John Ballard Trustee 08 June 2017 None on record
JOHN LOWTON NEWMAN Trustee
THE FRIENDS OF BRISTOL HORSES SOCIETY Received: On time
MICHAEL NEALE Trustee
THE FRIENDS OF BRISTOL HORSES SOCIETY Received: On time
THE HIGHFIELD FOUNDATION Received: 214 days late