SALEM HEALTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1121931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £318 £5.22k £4.32k £2.73k £4.74k
Total expenditure £2.58k £4.92k £4.31k £2.73k £4.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A