TEMPORARYCONTEMPORARY STUDIOS

Charity number: 1123395
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 May 2020 22 March 2021 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2019 28 January 2021 333 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2018 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2017 24 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2016 18 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2016 Not Required