Accounts and annual returns HEATON UNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1122227
Charity reporting is overdue by 33 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 Overdue Overdue by 33 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Overdue Overdue by 33 days
Annual return 31 October 2020 01 September 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 30 March 2021 211 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 13 January 2020 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 31 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required