Financial history HEATON UNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1122227
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £11.66k £10.00k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £155 £1.82k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A