EAST LONDON BUSINESS ALLIANCE

Charity number: 1122173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TERRY WALDRON FIH Trustee 29 May 2013
THE SAVOY EDUCATIONAL TRUST Received: On time
Kamran Ikram Trustee 15 April 2020 None on record
CHRISTOPHER IAN WATSON Chair None on record
Arthur Rakowski Trustee 13 September 2017 None on record
Lisa Hollins Trustee 11 February 2016 None on record
MARIE GABRIEL Trustee 12 February 2015
WEST HAM UNITED FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE NHS CONFEDERATION
NEWHAM PEOPLE’S TRUST FUND Overdue by 540 days
Rob A Knight Trustee 23 September 2020 None on record
Jenny Baskerville Trustee 11 February 2016 None on record
HUGH MORRIS Trustee 20 June 2018
THE CITY OF LONDON ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST FUND Received: On time