Financial history DURRELL WILDLIFE CONSERVATION TRUST - UK

Charity number: 1121989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £674.00k £3.33m £14.46m £1.87m £1.76m
Total expenditure £422.00k £1.16m £4.40m £12.58m £2.08m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £75.47k £107.00k £336.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £516.00k £3.17m £14.27m £1.73m £1.67m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £158.00k £162.00k £189.00k £138.00k £94.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £301.00k £2.99m £13.84m £1.19m £855.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £419.00k £1.15m £4.40m £12.57m £2.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.00k £5.00k £79.00k £17.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £4.32m £0 £2.03m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £3.00k £5.00k £0 £17.00k £48.00k