Trustees THE THORNTON AND ALLERTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Charity number: 1122128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Emily Hiley | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sonam Khan | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carole Roberts | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Molly Jewitt | Trustee | 05 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
MAZHAR ELLAHI | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Timothy Spencer | Trustee | 25 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Sheard | Trustee | 14 May 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.