THE SANSROD EDUCATIONAL AND WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1123215
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 May 2020 20 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 May 2020 20 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 May 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 May 2019 08 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 May 2018 13 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 May 2017 04 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 May 2016 14 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 May 2016 Not Required