THE SANSROD EDUCATIONAL AND WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1123215
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/05/2016 05/05/2017 05/05/2018 05/05/2019 05/05/2020
Total gross income £18.87k £13.39k £19.65k £29.07k £53.69k
Total expenditure £16.77k £16.34k £11.12k £25.07k £30.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A