V & O VISION

Charity number: 1122742
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 25 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 22 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 25 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 29 April 2017 26 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2015 30 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2015 Not Required