V & O VISION

Charity number: 1122742
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/10/2015 29/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £3.00k £0 £900 £980 £400
Total expenditure £1.01k £1.17k £13 £867 £13
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A