ASIA PACIFIC CHILDRENS FUND

Charity number: 1126009
Charity reporting is up to date (43 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 10 February 2021 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 10 February 2021 43 days late Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 18 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 18 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2018 03 February 2019 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 03 February 2019 37 days late Download
Annual return 28 February 2017 17 January 2018 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 17 January 2018 20 days late Download
Annual return 28 February 2016 21 February 2017 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 21 February 2017 55 days late Download