THE ASHMORE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1122351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JAMES CARLETON Trustee 19 July 2012
THE SOLDIERS, SAILORS, AIRMEN AND FAMILIES ASSOCIATION - FORCES HELP Received: On time
Alexandra Autrey Chair 01 October 2017 None on record
Andrew Brudenell Trustee 09 October 2019 None on record
Cemil Urganci Trustee 01 December 2020 None on record
Oscar Ardila Espindola Trustee 30 March 2021 None on record
Elizabeth Brown Trustee 09 October 2019 None on record
Jennifer Bingham Trustee 07 May 2019 None on record
Tim Jenkins Trustee 05 April 2021 None on record
Patrick Cadell Trustee 03 December 2020 None on record
Lydia Jessica Toisuta Trustee 05 April 2021 None on record
Matthew Hill Trustee 18 December 2019 None on record
Mark Coombs Trustee 10 October 2018 None on record