BRANDON UNITED FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1122705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 27 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 01 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 14 August 2020 136 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 21 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 17 May 2019 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 04 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 12 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 05 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 13 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 16 January 2017 On time Download