BRANDON UNITED FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1122705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £22.58k £36.90k £42.33k £80.59k £109.79k
Total expenditure £22.63k £31.77k £46.19k £99.43k £92.69k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k