UMMAH INTERNATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1124074
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 April 2021 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 13 December 2016 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required