SYMPHONIC WIND ORCHESTRA OF NORTH LONDON

Charity number: 1125311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £10.98k £10.11k £12.88k £14.25k £10.39k
Total expenditure £11.47k £9.47k £12.27k £13.79k £8.41k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A