Financial history AN AFRICAN DREAM

Charity number: 1123231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £31.25k £49.93k £43.02k £45.34k £52.61k
Total expenditure £33.81k £42.89k £48.92k £41.26k £52.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A