BHAKTI YOGA SOCIETY (BHAKTI PROJECTS UK)

Charity number: 1122503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2020 23 February 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2019 22 February 2021 384 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2018 17 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2017 01 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2016 25 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2016 Not Required