BHAKTI YOGA SOCIETY (BHAKTI PROJECTS UK)

Charity number: 1122503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 04/04/2016 04/04/2017 04/04/2018 04/04/2019 04/04/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A