MAGIC CARPET (EXETER)

Charity number: 1122778
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
VON MATHIESON Trustee 28 February 2012
GET CHANGED THEATRE COMPANY Received: On time
Dr Katherine Newstead Trustee 23 November 2018 None on record
Jacky Cox Trustee 23 January 2017 None on record
Claire Johnson Trustee 01 February 2021 None on record
Natalie Vizard Trustee 23 November 2018 None on record
Daisy Maya Binnie Trustee 23 January 2017
THE HOLLOW LANE CLUB Received: On time
Isaac Moss Trustee 30 June 2021 None on record