MEDICAL DETECTION DOGS

Charity number: 1124533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.47m £1.86m £1.92m £2.38m £1.66m
Total expenditure £1.04m £1.38m £1.85m £1.89m £2.04m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.40m £1.79m £1.83m £2.23m £1.54m
Income - Other trading activities £64.78k £69.61k £84.55k £147.47k £110.38k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.66k £4.70k £2.71k £3.77k £4.18k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £10.29k £93.81k £292.67k £674.35k £166.74k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £876.39k £1.20m £1.64m £1.66m £1.92m
Expenditure - Raising funds £151.30k £184.24k £206.24k £232.29k £118.54k
Expenditure - Governance £6.86k £4.99k £6.29k £6.65k £17.34k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £12.94k £0 £0 £0 £0