MEDICAL DETECTION DOGS

Charity number: 1124533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Steckler Trustee 19 March 2020 None on record
Clive Everest MA FCA Trustee 12 June 2019
BLUE CROSS Received: On time
DR ALAN RUTHERFORD MAKEPEACE FRCR FRCS Trustee 31 October 2016 None on record
Dr VICTORIA HORDERN MBBS MD Trustee 17 December 2013 None on record
THE HON MRS ELIZABETH DUNCAN SMITH Chair 02 October 2012 None on record
ANDREW KEEGAN Trustee 30 September 2014 None on record