Accounts and annual returns ANNA'S FUND

Charity number: 1123790
Charity reporting is overdue by 176 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 176 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 176 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 August 2020 202 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required