THE DOREEN DAPHNE SKINNER TRUST

Charity number: 1130045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £954 £107.79k £545 £664 £260
Total expenditure £332.08k £15.07k £2.00k £2.55k £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A