Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS CHURCH, NEWINGTON, FOLKESTONE

Charity number: 1122652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £9.80k £15.74k £13.92k £4.10k £8.66k
Total expenditure £18.05k £11.99k £16.16k £9.41k £2.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.13k £500 N/A N/A