Trustees INSTITUTE FOR GOVERNMENT
Charity number: 1123926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORD SAINSBURY OF TURVILLE | Chair | 22 January 2008 |
|
|
||||
Tamara Margaret Finkelstein | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dame Angela Eagle MP | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sir David Roy Lidington | Trustee | 17 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Baroness Susan Veronica Kramer | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
SIR RICHARD PETER LAMBERT | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sir IAN MICHAEL CHESHIRE | Trustee | 22 June 2016 |
|
|||||
Baroness Valerie Amos | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
MIRANDA THERESA CLAIRE CURTIS | Trustee | 01 September 2008 |
|
|
||||
SIR ANDREW THOMAS CAHN KCMG | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.