EATON COMMUNITY PARK ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1123311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kate Shepherd Trustee 08 May 2013 None on record
SHARON LOUISE DICKINSON BA Trustee None on record
Dr HELEN SMITH Trustee 13 November 2012 None on record
STUART JAMES HOGARTH Chair 03 May 2017 None on record
Kimberley Roberts Trustee 18 July 2017 None on record
Martin Davies Trustee 08 May 2013
THE FRIENDS OF ST DENYS, EATON Received: On time
DEREK LESLIE JANES Trustee 29 May 2019 None on record