ARDINGLY CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1123464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £16.87k £21.93k £16.65k £11.22k £13.63k
Total expenditure £16.24k £16.77k £17.58k £10.27k £15.77k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A