WORLD YOUTH SAILING TRUST

Charity number: 1124749
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 May 2020 02 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2019 09 April 2020 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 30 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required