WORLD YOUTH SAILING TRUST

Charity number: 1124749
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 01/05/2019 01/05/2020
Total gross income £657 £216 £58 £77 £77
Total expenditure £180 £186 £3.60k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A