Accounts and annual returns FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR MEDICAL STUDENTS

Charity number: 1123648
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 12 April 2023 27 February 2024 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 April 2023 27 February 2024 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 12 April 2022 10 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 12 April 2022 10 February 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 12 April 2021 11 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 12 April 2021 11 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 12 April 2020 12 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 12 April 2020 12 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 12 April 2019 12 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 12 April 2019 12 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window