Accounts and annual returns BARBARA KWATENG LUPUS TRUST

Charity number: 1124613
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2021 04 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2020 27 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2019 05 July 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2018 25 July 2019 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2017 22 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2017 Not Required