Financial history BILLINGSHURST FAMILY CHURCH

Charity number: 1123028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £147.10k £137.02k £129.03k £130.02k £127.77k
Total expenditure £149.57k £134.35k £139.02k £123.14k £107.62k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A