Trustees BILLINGSHURST FAMILY CHURCH

Charity number: 1123028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RACHEL ANNE BROWN Chair
None on record
Ruth Imogen FEAVER Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
Andrew John NEWBY Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
William RICHARDS Trustee 19 January 2021
None on record
LEE McGAHAN Trustee 21 October 2019
None on record
CRAIG OWEN GALE Trustee 22 September 2017
None on record
JOHN PETER FRAHER Trustee 22 March 2017
None on record