Trustees THE LONDON BALLET CIRCLE
Charity number: 1123258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN CAROL DALGETTY EZRA | Chair | 18 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Lilly | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Krissie Poyser | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ben Ettridge | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Erleigh | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Lynas | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|||||
CANDACE MARIE KUSS | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith John White | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA EVE VILLA | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALASTAIR OGILVIE THOMSON | Trustee | 19 January 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.